Z, Inc. v. Great Northern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Z, INC. d/b/a COBALT HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER and Z, Inc. doing business as Cobalt Health Care and Rehabilitation Center
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01010
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to extend the deadline for filing the Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #16 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/3/21. (Barry, Donna)
September 3, 2021 Reset Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/30/2021 (Barry, Donna)
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/30/2021 File Rule 26(f) Report by Z, Inc.. (Parrott, Brian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Z, Inc. (Isaac, Leonard)
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Parrott on behalf of Z, Inc. (Parrott, Brian)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Northern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Great Northern Insurance Company. (Small, Jonathan)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Great Northern Insurance Company.(Small, Jonathan)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/30/21. (Barry, Donna)
July 30, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Great Northern Insurance Company to 8/5/2021. (Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2021to File a Response to Complaint by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Small, Jonathan)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement in Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Small, Jonathan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #6 Docket Annotation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/22/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Docket Entry Correction re #5 Electronic Filing Order - PDF replaced with Judge Meyer's Electronic Filing Order. (Freberg, B)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/22/2021.(Freberg, B) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2021: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Freberg, B).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2021 Discovery due by 1/21/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2022 Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 22, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, J.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Small on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Small, Jonathan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company of No Pending Motions in State Court Action (Small, Jonathan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great Northern Insurance Company from Connecticut Superior Court for the Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV21-6143895-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6587296, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Small, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z, Inc. v. Great Northern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z, INC. d/b/a COBALT HEALTH CARE AND REHABILITATION CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z, Inc. doing business as Cobalt Health Care and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Leonard Merrill Isaac
Represented By: Brian R. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?