Asmodeo v. Doe
Petitioner: John Asmodeo
Respondent: John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv01042
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent file a response on or before November 1, 2021 why the relief prayed for in the petition for writ of habeas corpus should not be granted, and it is ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this order and a copy of the petition and all attachments, to respondent's representative, AUSA John Hughes of the Office of the United States Attorney by email on or before September 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/1/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/28/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/28/2021.(Freberg, B)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05112.
July 22, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to John Asmodeo, 71950-054 at 33 1/2 Pembroke Rd., Danbury, CT 06811. (dsh)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/21/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 21, 2021 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #3 Order, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (rdz)
June 10, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by John Asmodeo.(rdz)
June 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
June 9, 2021 *** Set/Clear Flags *** Added flag(s):PRO SE. (rdz)
June 9, 2021 *** Set/Clear Flags *** Added flag(s):PRO SE REVIEW. (rdz)
June 9, 2021 Pro Se Staff Attorney B. Lerner [Telephone Extension 0699] assigned case. Pro Se Staff Attorney Flag PSA-Lerner set. Pro Se Staff Attorney Action (Screening Memo to Judge/Sua Sponte Order to Dismiss, Amend or Transfer, or Order to Answer) due by 7/9/2021. (rdz)
June 9, 2021 ***Staff Notes: No IFP.(rdz)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from J. Asmodeo, dated 5/23/21 re: I have enclosed what I hope is the correct motion to obtain credit for time I served during the pretrial phase of my case. After my 4/23/14 arrest, I spent 29 days at the Putnam County Jail before posting bail on 5/20/14 etc. I have sought help via my case worker(and records) here but have gotten nowhere. Document filed by John Asmodeo.(sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asmodeo v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Asmodeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?