Vineyard Vines, LLC v. Mallsvince.shop et al
Plaintiff: Vineyard Vines, LLC
Defendant: Mallsvince.shop, Vineyardtopsvines.com, Zmaogeu.com, Southmtloon.shop, Caltun.shop, Harmun.shop, Vineyardvineshow.shop, Shopvineyardvines.com, Vineyardvinesdress.com, Wieyorvines.com, Vineyardvinesitem.com, Vineyardsclothing.com, Vineyarditemsvines.org, Dressvineyard.store, Sterty.shop, Vineyardvshop.com, Vineyardsshirt.com, Vineuradwear.online, Vineswomenswear.website, Vineyardfashion.store, Livevineyardvines.shop, Vineyardshirt.com, Jane Doe, John Doe, Jane Does and John Does
Case Number: 3:2021cv01047
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case) (Gutierrez, Y.)
September 14, 2021 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gutierrez, Y.)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Vineyard Vines, LLC (Volpe, Christina)
August 10, 2021 Docket Entry Correction: A replacement PDF was added to the ruling (Doc. #13 ) dated 08/09/21. (Barry, Donna)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice Motion to Effect Service of Process on Defendants by Email #12 . Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/09/21. (Walker, M.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2021: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Barry, Donna).
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Permission to Effect Service of Process on Defendants by Email Order by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Whitcomb, Jonathan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Whitcomb on behalf of Vineyard Vines, LLC (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
July 31, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #1 Complaint, filed by Vineyard Vines, LLC, #7 Standing Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Vineyard Vines, LLC, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 7/31/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Ex Parte Relief. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/30/21. (Brinn, Hope)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Caltun.shop, Jane Does, John Does, Dressvineyard.store, Harmun.shop, Livevineyardvines.shop, Mallsvince.shop, Shopvineyardvines.com, Southmtloon.shop, Sterty.shop, Vineswomenswear.website, Vineuradwear.online, Vineyardfashion.store, Vineyarditemsvines.org, Vineyardsclothing.com, Vineyardshirt.com, Vineyardsshirt.com, Vineyardtopsvines.com, Vineyardvinesdress.com, Vineyardvineshow.shop, Vineyardvinesitem.com, Vineyardvshop.com, Wieyorvines.com, Zmaogeu.com* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christina Volpe* *Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni LLP* *1010 Washington Boulevard, Suite 800* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 Report on the filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/29/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/29/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2021, Discovery due by 1/28/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2022 Signed by Clerk on 7/29/21.(Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 EXPARTE MOTION Emergency Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of A Temporary Restaining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Christina L. Winsor, #3 Declaration of Justin Zamparelli, #4 Declaration of Olivia Pesce, #5 [Proposed] Temporary Restaining Order and Order to Show Cause)(Volpe, Christina)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Volpe, Christina)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6594839.), filed by Vineyard Vines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Volpe, Christina)
July 29, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Volpe, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vineyard Vines, LLC v. Mallsvince.shop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vineyard Vines, LLC
Represented By: Christina Volpe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallsvince.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardtopsvines.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zmaogeu.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southmtloon.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caltun.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmun.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardvineshow.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shopvineyardvines.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardvinesdress.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wieyorvines.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardvinesitem.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardsclothing.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyarditemsvines.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dressvineyard.store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterty.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardvshop.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardsshirt.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineuradwear.online
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineswomenswear.website
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardfashion.store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livevineyardvines.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vineyardshirt.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?