Walsh v. Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC and Pedro Coelho
Case Number: 3:2021cv01051
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Please use the following dial in information for the call. Dial 866-434-5269, Access Code 8189198#. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 3/25/2022; Initial Status Report due by 10/22/2021; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive motions due 2/8/2022; Settlement Conference 4/2022; Trial Ready Date 6/29/2022; Trial Brief due by 4/29/2022. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/22/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 21, 2021 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lee, Garrett)
September 7, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pedro Coelho, Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC. (Marks, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pedro Coelho, Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC.(Marks, Andrew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett Jorgen Lee on behalf of Martin J. Walsh (Lee, Garrett)
August 11, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pedro Coelho waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021 filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Pedulla, Mark)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC waiver sent on 8/5/2021, answer due 10/4/2021 filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Pedulla, Mark)
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Warner on behalf of Pedro Coelho, Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC (Warner, David)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marks on behalf of Pedro Coelho, Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC (Marks, Andrew)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consent Preliminary Injunction and Order Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/5/2021.(Bozek, M.)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/5/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 CANCELLATION NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for 8/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny is CANCELLED. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Martin J. Walsh.Responses due by 8/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order (Statement of Employee Rights))(Pedulla, Mark)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin J. Walsh re 10 Calendar Entry, (Pedulla, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Conference Re: #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction set for 8/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Please use the following dial in information for the call. Dial 866-434-5269, Access Code 8189198#. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pedro Coelho, Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark Pedulla* *JFK Federal Building* *Suite E-375* *Boston, MA 02203*. (Peterson, M)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martin J. Walsh re #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order, #7 Electronic Service Documents, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint (Pedulla, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Martin J. Walsh, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Martin J. Walsh. Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order For Fair Labor Standards Act Cases Not Pleaded as Collective Actions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2021, Discovery due by 2/1/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A (Declaration of Christine Oliveira))(Pedulla, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pedulla, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Pedulla, Mark)
August 2, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Mark Pedulla
Represented By: Garrett Jorgen Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padaminas NY Bakery II, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Marks
Represented By: David S. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Coelho
Represented By: Andrew Marks
Represented By: David S. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?