Medeiros et al v. Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dominic Medeiros and Sheila Marcil
Defendant: Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01056
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT re #36 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Arbitrate Individually and Stay This Litigation Signed By Douglas J. Klein filed by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Klein, Douglas)
September 24, 2021 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT re #36 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Arbitrate Individually and Stay This Litigation Signed By Dauvin Peterson filed by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Klein, Douglas)
September 24, 2021 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support re #36 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Arbitrate Individually and Stay This Litigation filed by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Klein, Douglas)
September 24, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Arbitrate Individually and Stay This Litigation by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc..Responses due by 10/15/2021 (Klein, Douglas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J Klein on behalf of Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. (Klein, Douglas)
September 15, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison M. Benz on behalf of Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. (Benz, Allison)
September 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lewis Lounsbury on behalf of Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. (Lounsbury, Adam)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER finding as moot #22 Motion to Appear for Attorney Douglas J. Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear for Attorney Douglas J. Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER finding as moot #20 Motion to Appear for Attorney Adam L. Lounsbury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear for Attorney Adam L. Lounsbury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER finding as moot #18 Motion to Appear for Attorney Allison M. Benz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear for Attorney Allison M. Benz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/14/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
September 13, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golder, David)
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Lounsbury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golder, David)
September 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison M. Benz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golder, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6644270) by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Golder, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas J. Klein to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6644270) by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golder, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Lounsbury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6644220) by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Golder, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam L. Lounsbury to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6644220) by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golder, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison M. Benz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6644200) by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Golder, David)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Allison M. Benz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6644200) by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Golder, David)
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Thomson on behalf of Sheila Marcil, Dominic Medeiros (Thomson, Matthew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold L. Lichten on behalf of Sheila Marcil, Dominic Medeiros (Lichten, Harold)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/23/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear for Attorney Matthew Thomson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew Thomson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6618600) by Sheila Marcil, Dominic Medeiros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew Thomson)(Rubin, Zachary)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harold L. Lichten to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6618596) by Sheila Marcil, Dominic Medeiros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Harold Lichten)(Rubin, Zachary)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Golder, David)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/24/2021 in which to file a pleading in response to Plaintiffs' Class and Collective Action Complaint dated August 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/18/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 24, 2021 to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Golder, David)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Golder on behalf of Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. (Golder, David)
August 18, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. to 9/24/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominic Medeiros, Sheila Marcil. Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Rubin, Zachary)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary L. Rubin* *Lichten & Liss-Riordan,-P.-C* *729 Boylston St, Suite 2000* *Boston, MA 02116*. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Sheila Marcil, Dominic Medeiros, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2021, Discovery due by 2/1/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2021. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 2, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Point Pickup Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6597943.), filed by Dominic Medeiros, Sheila Marcil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Dominic Medeiros Opt In Form, #3 Exhibit Sheila Marcil Opt In Form)(Rubin, Zachary)
August 2, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.. (Rubin, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medeiros et al v. Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Medeiros
Represented By: Zachary L. Rubin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Matthew W. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Marcil
Represented By: Zachary L. Rubin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Represented By: Matthew W. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point Pickup Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Golder
Represented By: Douglas J Klein
Represented By: Adam Lewis Lounsbury
Represented By: Allison M. Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?