Robinson v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: Azumah Robinson
Defendant: Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv01074
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #9 Recommended Ruling. The Court hereby adopts the Recommended Ruling made by Judge Merriam on August 27, 2021. Recommended Ruling, ECF No. #9 (Aug. 27, 2021) (the "Ruling"). According to the Ruling, the plaintiff had to file an Amended Complaint by September 10, 2021 or an objection to the Ruling by September 10, 2021. These dates have passed and yet, the plaintiff has failed to take either action. Finding that the plaintiff has had ample time to file an Amended Complaint or an objection, this case is dismissed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) (involuntary dismissal if a plaintiff fails to comply with a court order); LeSane v. Hall's Sec. Analyst, Inc., 239 F.3d 206, 209 (2d Cir. 2001) ("[I]t is unquestioned that Rule 41(b)... gives the district court authority to dismiss a plaintiff's case sua sponte for failure to prosecute.") (citing Link v. Wabash R.R. Co., 370 U.S. 626, 630 (1962)); see also Dietz v. Bouldin, 136 S. Ct. 1885, 1892 (2016) ("[D]istrict courts have the inherent authority to manage their dockets and courtrooms with a view toward the efficient and expedient resolution of cases.").The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/15/2021. (Castano, Nelson)
August 30, 2021 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2021.(Perez, J.)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached Recommended Ruling, the undersigned recommends that the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) be DISMISSED, without prejudice. Plaintiff shall carefully read the attached Recommended Ruling for important details and deadlines. Any objections to this Recommended Ruling must be filed on or before September 10, 2021. Failure to file an objection by that deadline will preclude appellate review. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/27/2021.(Weis, Anne)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . Plaintiff asserts that he is self-employed as an entrepreneur and that his gross weekly income is $350. See id. at 3. Plaintiff reports that he receives no other income, and has $185.17 in his checking account. See id. at 3-4. He further contends that his monthly obligations total $1,246. See id. at 4. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/27/2021. (Weis, Anne)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam including #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and for initial review of the Complaint #1 pursuant to 28 USC 1915. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2021.Motions referred to Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam(Perez, J.)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2021; Discovery due by 2/8/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Consent to Electronic Notice by Azumah Robinson. (Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Azumah Robinson. (Freberg, B)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, filed by Azumah Robinson.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azumah Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?