Mesite v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Plaintiff: ROSALIE MESITE
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01111
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
October 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Cileena Terra-Espinal on behalf of Rosalie Mesite (Terra-Espinal, Cileena)
October 5, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/15/2021 (Johnson, D.)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The joint motion (ECF No. #15 ) for extension of time is GRANTED. The parties' Rule 26(f) report is due October 15, 2021.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/5/2021. (Wong, Qing Wai)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/15/2021 to Submit Rule 26(f) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Kastukevich Robert on behalf of Rosalie Mesite (Robert, Brianna)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon David Biller on behalf of Rosalie Mesite (Biller, Jon)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The consent motion (ECF No. #11 ) for extension of time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is GRANTED. The Defendant's responsive pleading is due October 30, 2021. Because of the length of this extension, the Court is not likely to grant further extensions of this deadline.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/23/2021. (Wong, Qing Wai)
August 23, 2021 Answer deadline updated for AIG Property Casualty Company to 10/30/2021. (Johnson, D.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 30, 2021 to file a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Pollard Thompson on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Pending Motions filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #8 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Aubrey E. Blatchley on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2021. Discovery due by 2/17/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2022. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 18, 2021 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Pollard Thompson on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company (Thompson, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey E. Blatchley on behalf of AIG Property Casualty Company (Blatchley, Aubrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Company Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for AIG Property Casualty Company. (Blatchley, Aubrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by AIG Property Casualty Company Notice of Pending Motions (Blatchley, Aubrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AIG Property Casualty Company from Connecticut Superior Court, case number NNH-CV21-6115834-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6616160, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Blatchley, Aubrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesite v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSALIE MESITE
Represented By: Jon David Biller
Represented By: Brianna Kastukevich Robert
Represented By: Cileena Terra-Espinal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael Pollard Thompson
Represented By: Aubrey E. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?