Wang v. Quiros et al
Plaintiff: Lishan Wang
Defendant: Angel Quiros, Nick Rodriguez, Rollin Cook, Kenneth Butricks, Kristine Barone, Marie Charles, K. Shea, R. Richeson, Naqvi, Caroline, Michelle, Tutu, Harmon, Scholtz, Boyd, Rivera, Cooper, Rodriguez and Carbone
Case Number: 3:2021cv01133
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kristine Barone, Marie Charles, Rollin Cook, Harmon, Angel Quiros, R. Richeson, Nick Rodriguez, K. Shea, filed by Lishan Wang.(Freberg, B)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Days to Prepare an Amended Complaint by Lishan Wang. (Freberg, B)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/4/2021.(Alexander, R.)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to file Prisoner's IFP Application in light of the grant of IFP at ECF 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 9/23/21. (Payton, R.)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Prisoner's IFP Application by Lishan Wang. (Payton, R.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lishan Wang. (Peterson, M)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lishan Wang. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Prisoner's IFP Application by Lishan Wang. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 9/17/21. (Payton, R.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lishan Wang. (Carr, Dave)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lishan Wang. (Bozek, M.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lishan Wang. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Bozek, M.)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application sent to you via U.S. Mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 9/21/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 8/31/21.(Payton, R.)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/24/2021.(Bozek, M.)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/24/2021.(Bozek, M.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lishan Wang. (Bozek, M.)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Kristine Barone, Boyd, Kenneth Butricks, Carbone, Caroline, Marie Charles, Rollin Cook, Cooper, Harmon, Michelle, Naqvi, Angel Quiros, R. Richeson, Rivera, Rodriguez, Nick Rodriguez, Scholtz, K. Shea, Tutu, filed by Lishan Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two, #3 Exhibit Three, #4 Exhibit Four, #5 Exhibit Five, #6 Envelope One, #7 Envelope Two, #8 Envelope Three)(Bozek, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Quiros et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lishan Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Butricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Barone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?