Murphy Medical Associates, LLC et al v. Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC and Steven A.R. Murphy
Defendant: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF NEW YORK, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC., and Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01137
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER approving Proposed Pretrial Order Consented-to Briefing Schedule #15 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/15/21. (Guerrier, C.)
October 13, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Hallak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6657023) by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Hallak, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets, #8 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy filed by Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Murphy Medical Associates v Molina Complaint, #3 Exhibit Cigna's SIU report, #4 Exhibit Gloria v Manuel, #5 Exhibit Matava v CTPPS LLC, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeff Barlow, #7 Exhibit Mills v Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee Inc, #8 Exhibit Doe v United Health Group Inc, #9 Exhibit Hartford Healthcare Corp v Anthem Health Plans Inc, #10 Exhibit Wiener v AXA Equitable Life Ins Co, #11 Exhibit Avetisyants v Astromedia Global Inc, #12 Certificate of Service)(Nazir, Zaara)
October 8, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and improper venue and failure to state a claim in lieu of filing an answer by Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc..Responses due by 10/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit Cigna's SIU report, #5 Exhibit Murphy Medical Associates v Molina Complaint, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeff Barlow, #7 Exhibit District Courts Cases Commenced, #8 Exhibit Matava v CTPPS LLC, #9 Exhibit Paskiewicz v Brower, #10 Exhibit American Video Duplicating Inc v City National Bank, #11 Exhibit Healthcare Ventures of Ohio LLC v HVO Operations Windup LLC, #12 Exhibit Mills v Bluecross Blueshield of Tennessee Inc, #13 Exhibit Doe v United Health Group Inc, #14 Exhibit Hartford Healthcare Corp v Anthem Health Plans Inc, #15 Exhibit Wiener v AXA Equitable Life Ins Co, #16 Exhibit Pettengill v Firemans Fund Ins Co, #17 Exhibit Dekutowski-Cook v Pavalock, #18 Exhibit Sullivan v Allstate Ins Co, #19 Exhibit LS Parry Inc v Tepeyac LLC, #20 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #21 Certificate of Service)(Nazir, Zaara)
September 27, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Zaara Bajwa Nazir on behalf of Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Nazir, Zaara)
September 27, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Hamelsky on behalf of Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Hamelsky, Andrew)
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Scott Hallak on behalf of Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC Pro Hac Vice (Hallak, Daniel)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Attorney Daniel S. Hallak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2021. (Oliver, T.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 Docket Entry Correction re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Hallak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6657023) MODIFIED TO ADD A REPLACEMENT PDF OF THE AFFIDAVIT TO THE DOCKET ENTRY (Oliver, T.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Andrew Hamelsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2021. (Oliver, T.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Attorney Zaara Bajwa Nazir to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2021. (Oliver, T.)
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Hallak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6657023) by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit AAffidavit of Daniel S. Hallak, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Certificate of Service)(Breitenbach, Roy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2021: #4 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.).
September 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Hamelsky to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6656369) by Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Andrew Hamelsky in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Menge, Christa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Zaara Bajwa Nazir to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6656346) by Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Zaara Bajwa Nazir in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Menge, Christa)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Pretrial Order Consented-to Briefing Schedule by Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Menge, Christa)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/17/21. (Guerrier, C.)
September 15, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/29/2021. (Guerrier, C.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2021Unopposed by Plaintiff To Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Menge, Christa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christa Menge on behalf of Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Menge, Christa)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order for PJR Hearing, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of PJR, #3 Exhibit C-Writ, Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Proposed Order granting PJR, #5 Exhibit E- Notice of Application/Claim for Hearing to Contest or Claim Exemption, #6 Exhibit F- Declaration of Steven A.R. Murphy, M.D., #7 Exhibit G-Memorandum of law in support of PJR and Disclosure of Assets)(Breitenbach, Roy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Roy Breitenbach* *Harris Beach PLLC* *333 Earle Ovington Boulevard, Suite 901* *Uniondale, NY 11553*. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, #1 Complaint, filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC Signed by Clerk on 8/25/2021. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/25/2021. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/25/2021. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2021 Discovery due by 2/24/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2022 Signed by Clerk on 8/25/2021. (Oliver, T.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint (Breitenbach, Roy)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF NEW YORK, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC., ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6622806.), filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy.(Breitenbach, Roy) Modified on 8/25/2021 to correct filing parties (Anastasio, F.).
August 25, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc. (Breitenbach, Roy) Modified on 8/25/2021 TO CORRECT THE PARTIES (Oliver, T.).
August 24, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy Medical Associates, LLC et al v. Molina Healthcare of New York, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy Medical Associates, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hallak
Represented By: Roy Breitenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hallak
Represented By: Roy Breitenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven A.R. Murphy
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hallak
Represented By: Roy Breitenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF NEW YORK, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Hamelsky
Represented By: Christa Menge
Represented By: Zaara Bajwa Nazir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Hamelsky
Represented By: Christa Menge
Represented By: Zaara Bajwa Nazir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?