Deprey et al v. Diamond Auto Cars, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Deprey and Alexis Garcia
Defendant: Diamond Auto Cars, LLC and Westlake Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01160
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting defendant Diamond Auto Cars, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #11 ) to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/7/21. (Barry, Donna)
October 7, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Diamond Auto Cars, LLC to 11/1/2021. (Barry, Donna)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 1, 2021 File Answer by Diamond Auto Cars, LLC. (Rozich, Kenneth)
October 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Rozich on behalf of Diamond Auto Cars, LLC (Rozich, Kenneth)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Westlake Services, LLC waiver sent on 9/1/2021, answer due 10/31/2021 filed by Melanie Deprey; Alexis Garcia. (Blinn, Daniel)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Deprey, Alexis Garcia. Diamond Auto Cars, LLC served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Blinn, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Westlake Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Carr, Dave)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Diamond Auto Cars, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Carr, Dave)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Melanie Deprey, Alexis Garcia Signed by Clerk on 08/31/2021.(Carr, Dave)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/30/2021.(Carr, Dave)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/30/2021.(Carr, Dave)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2021 Discovery due by 3/1/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2022 Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2021.(Carr, Dave)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diamond Auto Cars, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6628790.), filed by Melanie Deprey, Alexis Garcia.(Blinn, Daniel)
August 30, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Diamond Auto Cars, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
August 30, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, J.)
August 30, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Westlake Services, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deprey et al v. Diamond Auto Cars, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Deprey
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Garcia
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Auto Cars, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Rozich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?