USA v. Shotkin et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Frederick Shotkin, Matthew P. Shotkin, Susan Shotkin Gascon, Finance of America Reverse LLC and Town of Westport
Case Number: 3:2021cv01164
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Susan Shotkin Gascon waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 12/21/2021 filed by USA. (Shapiro, Alan) Modified on 10/12/2021 to correct answer date (LaLone, L.).
October 6, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Frederick Shotkin waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021 filed by USA. (Shapiro, Alan)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matthew P. Shotkin waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021 filed by USA. (Shapiro, Alan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Finance of America Reverse LLC (Milne, Geoffrey)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey K. Milne on behalf of Finance of America Reverse LLC (Milne, Geoffrey)
September 17, 2021 Cases associated. Create association to 3:19-cv-01506-JCH. (Freberg, B)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Town of Westport waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021 filed by USA. (Shapiro, Alan)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/7/2021.(Bozek, M.)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Finance of America Reverse LLC, Frederick Shotkin, Matthew P. Shotkin, Susan Shotkin Gascon, Town of Westport* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alan Shapiro* *DOJ-Tax* *P.O. Box 55* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #5 standing Protective Order, #2 Exhibit more accurately described as Proposed Summonses, filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 09/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/31/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/31/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2021. Discovery due by 3/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2022. Signed by Clerk on 08/31/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBIT more accurately described as Proposed Summonses by USA re #1 Complaint, Request to Issue Summons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Frederick Shotkin, #2 Proposed Summons for Matthew P. Shotkin, #3 Proposed Summons for Susan Shotkin Gascon (or Cascon), #4 Proposed Summons for Finance of America Reverse LLC, #5 Proposed Summons for Town of Westport, Connecticut)(Shapiro, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shapiro, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 31, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Shapiro, Alan)
August 31, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Hushin, Z.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Shotkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Alan Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Shotkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew P. Shotkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Shotkin Gascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finance of America Reverse LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Milne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Westport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?