NEMS, PLLC v. Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NEMS, PLLC
Defendant: Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. and Health Plan Holdings, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01169
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021; Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2022, Discovery due by 9/30/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2022; Status Report due by 1/25/2022; Trial Brief due by 10/22/2022. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/25/2021.(DeRubeis, B.)
October 20, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc..Responses due by 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
October 20, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEMS, PLLC, Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC for NEMS, PLLC. (Allentuch, Simon)
October 20, 2021 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Allentuch, Simon)
October 4, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Mueller on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2021.(Freberg, B)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/17/2021.(Lewis, D)
September 17, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2021; granting #16 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #19 Motion for Protective Order; granting 20 Oral Motion for Extension of Time. Answer deadline extended to 10/20/2021. 08 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
September 17, 2021 Filing 20 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days to file Answer by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc.. (Lewis, D)
September 17, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. to 10/20/2021; Health Plan Holdings, Inc. to 10/20/2021. (Lewis, D)
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc..Responses due by 10/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF AMENDED E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9/17/2021. At counsel's request, Telephonic Status Conference in civil cases 21cv1169 & 21cv1172 set for 9/17/2021 has been changed to 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (Calendar amended to reflect change in time only.) (DeRubeis, B.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference in civil cases 21cv1169 & 21cv1172 set for 9/17/2021 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (DeRubeis, B.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:21-cv-01172 by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc..Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/8/2021 to File Responsive Pleading. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/3/2021. (Lewis, D)
September 3, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. to 10/8/2021; Health Plan Holdings, Inc. to 10/8/2021. (Lewis, D)
September 3, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2021 (Lewis, D)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/8/2021 to File Responsive Pleading by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc.. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice (Other) filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Point32Health, Inc., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Point32Health, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Point32Health, Inc., #10 Protective Order, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Point32Health, Inc., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Point32Health, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Point32Health, Inc., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #11 Standing Order re: Discovery. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order re: Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/1/2021.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/1/2021.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/1/2021.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2021; Discovery due by 3/3/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2021.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2021 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Walker, J.)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. of Pending Motions (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc.. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Health Plan Holdings, Inc.. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P Retersdorf on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV21-6116817-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6631853, filed by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal)(Retersdorf, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEMS, PLLC v. Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEMS, PLLC
Represented By: Simon Irving Allentuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth P Retersdorf
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth P Retersdorf
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Simon Irving Allentuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?