Yuzvik v. United States Liability Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eduard Yuzvik
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv01170
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scarlett M. Rajbanshi on behalf of United States Liability Insurance Company (Rajbanshi, Scarlett)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Attorney Scarlett M. Rajbanshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2021. (Carr, Dave)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scarlett M. Rajbanshi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6656617) by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scarlett M. Rajbanshi, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gemmell, Ian)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States Liability Insurance Company.(Gemmell, Ian)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #8 Protective Order, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by United States Liability Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 09/02/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(Carr, Dave)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/01/2021.(Carr, Dave)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/01/2021.(Carr, Dave)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2021 Discovery due by 3/3/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2022 Signed by Clerk on 09/01/2021.(Carr, Dave)
September 1, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, J.)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Gemmell, Ian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gemmell, Ian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gemmell, Ian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian James Gemmell on behalf of United States Liability Insurance Company (Gemmell, Ian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Liability Insurance Company from Stamford JD, case number FST-CV21-6052947-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6631948, filed by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Gemmell, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuzvik v. United States Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduard Yuzvik
Represented By: Lewis H. Chimes
Represented By: Mary-Kate Georgette Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian James Gemmell
Represented By: Scarlett M. Rajbanshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?