Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC v. Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC
Defendant: Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. and Health Plan Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01172
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Cases associated. Create association to 3:21-cv-01169-JCH. (Freberg, B)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/17/2021.(Lewis, D)
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2021; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #15 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Answer deadline extended to 10/20/2021. 08 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF AMENDED E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9/17/2021. At counsel's request, Telephonic Status Conference in civil cases 21cv1169 & 21cv1172 set for 9/17/2021 has been changed to 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (Calendar amended to reflect change in time only.) (DeRubeis, B.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference in civil cases 21cv1169 & 21cv1172 set for 9/17/2021 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (DeRubeis, B.)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/7/2021. (Ferguson, L.)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:21-cv-01169 by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc..Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/6/2021.(Perez, J.)
September 2, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/8/2021 to File Responsive Pleading by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc.. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice of Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Casesfiled by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #10 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth P Retersdorf on behalf of Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., #7 Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal filed by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 09/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2021. Discovery due by 3/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 09/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 1, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. of Pending Motions (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Health Plan Holdings, Inc.. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc.. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P Retersdorf on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc., Health Plan Holdings, Inc. (Retersdorf, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV21-6116818-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6632157, filed by Health Plan Holdings, Inc., Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal)(Retersdorf, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC v. Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Emergency Medicine Specialists, LLC
Represented By: Simon Irving Allentuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Pilgrim Health Care of Connecticut, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth P Retersdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth P Retersdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?