Rivera v. New England Joint Board et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Rivera
Defendant: New England Joint Board and General Cable Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01182
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Edwin Rivera.(Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Edwin Rivera. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to New England Joint Board waiver sent on 10/8/2021, answer due 12/7/2021 filed by Edwin Rivera. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Rothgeb on behalf of New England Joint Board (Rothgeb, Nicole)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: See attached Prefiling Conference Request. The prefiling Conference Requirement is hereby waived. Defendant, General Cable Industries, Inc. may file their Partial Motion to Dismiss without a prefiling conference. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/1/2021. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Shea, Jr on behalf of General Cable Industries, Inc. (Shea, John)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn A. Trotta on behalf of General Cable Industries, Inc. (Trotta, Carolyn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *General Cable Industries, Inc., New England Joint Board* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lorenzo J. Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello* *582 West Main St.* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Edwin Rivera, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/03/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/03/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2021. Discovery due by 3/5/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2022. Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6634402.), filed by Edwin Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint)(Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
September 3, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Cicchiello, Lorenzo)
September 3, 2021 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. New England Joint Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Rivera
Represented By: Lorenzo J. Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Joint Board
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Cable Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn A. Trotta
Represented By: John P. Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?