Oyarzun v. President/CEO et al
Plaintiff: Luisa Oyarzun, Sui Juris and The Natural Living Woman
Defendant: President/CEO, Exchange Place Preservation Partners, LLC, Fred C Mitchell, Exchange Place MM LLC, The NHP Foundation, Lori Caruso, Christine Tucci, Willy Quiles, Awilda Hand, NHP Foundation and Exchange Plaza Towers & Beacon Rental Community
Case Number: 3:2021cv01230
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Pesta, J.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luisa Oyarzun, #8 Electronic Summons Issued, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Electronic Summons Issued, #1 Complaint filed by Luisa Oyarzun, #5 Protective Order, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 9/20/21.(Pesta, J.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lori Caruso, Exchange Place MM LLC, Exchange Place Preservation Partners, LLC, Exchange Plaza Towers & Beacon Rental Community, Awilda Hand, Fred C Mitchell, NHP Foundation, President/CEO, Willy Quiles, Christine Tucci* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Luisa Oyarzun* *44 Center Street, Apt. 2P* *Waterbury, CT 06702*. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 9/20/2021 (Pesta, J.). Summons not required for service
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lori Caruso, Exchange Place MM LLC, Exchange Place Preservation Partners, LLC, Awilda Hand, Fred C Mitchell, President/CEO, Willy Quiles, The NHP Foundation, The Natural Living Woman, Christine Tucci* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Luisa Oyarzun* *44 Center Street, Apt. 2P* *Waterbury, CT 06702*. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 9/20/2021 (Pesta, J.).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/17/21. (Barry, Donna)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/15/2021.(Carr, Dave)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/15/2021.(Carr, Dave)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2021 Discovery due by 3/17/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 4/21/2022 Signed by Clerk on 9/15/2021.(Carr, Dave)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luisa Oyarzun. (Carr, Dave)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Luisa Oyarzun. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Carr, Dave)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oyarzun v. President/CEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisa Oyarzun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sui Juris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Natural Living Woman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President/CEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exchange Place Preservation Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred C Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exchange Place MM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The NHP Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willy Quiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awilda Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHP Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exchange Plaza Towers & Beacon Rental Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?