Alston v. Shayna et al
Plaintiff: Deontae Joseph Alston
Defendant: Shayna, Deirdre Monahan, Blanchette, Cody Picard and Piper
Case Number: 3:2021cv01256
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff, Deontae Joseph Alston, initiated this action by filing a civil rights Complaint, see Compl., ECF No. 1 (Sept. 21, 2021), and a Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 2 (Sept. 21, 2021). On September 29, 2021, Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish issued a Notice of Insufficiency indicating that the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis was deficient and instructed Mr. Alston to file a new Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within twenty-one days. See Notice to Petitioner re: Insufficiency, ECF No. 7 (Sept. 29, 2021). Judge Farrish warned Mr. Alston that if he failed to file the application within the time specified, the case would be dismissed. Id. To date, Mr. Alston has not filed a new Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or otherwise responded to the Court's Notice of Insufficiency. Accordingly, the Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, ECF No. #2 , is DENIED and the Complaint, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court respectfully is directed to close this case. Any motion to reopen must show cause why Mr. Alston did not comply with the Court's Notice of Insufficiency in a timely manner. The motion to reopen shall be accompanied by a completed Prisoner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, including a copy of a ledger sheet showing the last six months of transactions in Mr. Alston's inmate account. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/08/2021. (Lee, Diana)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Although you have sworn under penalty of perjury that the responses in the IFP application are truthful, the responses in question 6 do not accurately reflect the deposits shown on your Inmate Account Statement. Please file a new IFP application. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 10/20/2021 Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 9/29/21.(Payton, R.)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 09/21/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/21/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/21/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Deontae Joseph Alston. (Fazekas, J.)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deontae Joseph Alston. (Fazekas, J.)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Blanchette, Deirdre Monahan, Cody Picard, Piper, Shayna, filed by Deontae Joseph Alston.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. Shayna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deontae Joseph Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deirdre Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Picard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?