USA v. Samuel
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Carolyn Samuel
Case Number: 3:2021cv01269
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/16/21.(LaLone, L.)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Sarala V. Nagala for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2021.(Hushin, Z.)
November 16, 2021 Judge Sarala V. Nagala added. Judge Alfred V. Covello no longer assigned to case. (Hushin, Z.)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carolyn Samuel waiver sent on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021 filed by USA. (Lizama, Thelma)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carolyn Samuel* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thelma A Lizama* *DOJ-Tax* *P.O. Box 55* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Fazekas, J.)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 09/23/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/22/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolyn Samuel, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Lizama, Thelma)
September 22, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Carolyn Samuel. (Lizama, Thelma)
September 22, 2021 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Walker, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Thelma A Lizama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?