Amica Mutual Ins. Co v. Shea et al
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Ins. Co
Defendant: James B. Shea, Jr. and Audrey Shea
Case Number: 3:2021cv01299
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 14 OBJECTION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Finkelstein, Mara)
November 8, 2021 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2021 (Perez, J.)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Audrey Shea, James B. Shea, Jr.Responses due by 11/26/2021 (Isaac, Leonard)
November 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Parrott on behalf of Audrey Shea, James B. Shea, Jr (Parrott, Brian)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Audrey Shea, James B. Shea, Jr (Isaac, Leonard)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co. Audrey Shea served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021; James B. Shea, Jr served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. (Finkelstein, Mara)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James B. Shea, Jr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mara E Finkelstein* *Sloane & Walsh LLP* *148 Eastern Boulevard, Suite 105* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Fazekas, J.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Audrey Shea* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mara E Finkelstein* *Sloane & Walsh LLP* *148 Eastern Boulevard, Suite 105* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Fazekas, J.)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Amica Mutual Ins. Co, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by John Anthony Donovan, III Amica Mutual Ins. Co, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Mara E Finkelstein on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 09/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2021. Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2022. Signed by Clerk on 09/30/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara E Finkelstein on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (Finkelstein, Mara)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Donovan, III on behalf of Amica Mutual Ins. Co (Donovan, John)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Audrey Shea, James B. Shea, Jr ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6668554.), filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Finkelstein, Mara)
September 30, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Audrey Shea. (Finkelstein, Mara)
September 30, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to James B. Shea, Jr. (Finkelstein, Mara)
September 30, 2021 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Walker, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amica Mutual Ins. Co v. Shea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amica Mutual Ins. Co
Represented By: John Anthony Donovan, III
Represented By: Mara E Finkelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Shea, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard Merrill Isaac
Represented By: Brian R. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Shea
Represented By: Leonard Merrill Isaac
Represented By: Brian R. Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?