Vollano v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lanecia Vollano
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv01367
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The Government having filed the administrative record on December 7, 2021, the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than February 5, 2022. Defendant shall then have until April 6, 2022 to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand. Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d). Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, the parties are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Scheduling Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion.Requests for extensions of these deadlines are discouraged and, unless unusual circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should not seek an extension of greater than thirty (30) days. Any motion for extension of a deadline must include a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline. SO ORDERED at Hartford, Connecticut. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 12/8/2021. (Esposito, A.)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 Social Security Transcripts. (McKimens, Pam)
December 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Pam McKimens on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (McKimens, Pam)
December 1, 2021 Docket Entry Correction re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time, entered in error incorrect case number. (Fanelle, N.)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 ***Entered in Error*** MOTION for Extension of Time by Lanecia Vollano. (Fanelle, N.) Modified on 12/1/2021, entered in error incorrect case number. (Fanelle, N.).
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security, Lanecia Vollano. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/21/2021.(Anastasio, F.)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lanecia Vollano Magistrate Consent (Merritt, Hannalore)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . Plaintiff has completed the required information. Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no income and minimal assets. See generally id. at 3-4. Plaintiff also states that she and her three children receive "Food Stamps" and are otherwise supported by friends and family. See id. at 2-3, 5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/15/2021. (Katz, S.)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
October 14, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam. (Anastasio, F.)
October 14, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 12/13/2021. (Fazekas, J.)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lanecia Vollano. (Merritt, Hannalore)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lanecia Vollano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merritt, Hannalore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vollano v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanecia Vollano
Represented By: Hannalore Burns Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Pam McKimens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?