Ranno v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ranno
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes, Inc and Johnson & Johnson Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv01455
Filed: October 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:21-cv-03010, filed 12/02/2021. (Oliver, T.)
December 2, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Texas. (Oliver, T.)
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 Amended SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ranno. Johnson & Johnson Inc served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Barnes, Joseph)
November 30, 2021 Filing 10 MDL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 11/30/2021.(Freberg, B)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 Amended SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ranno. (Barnes, Joseph)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ranno. All Defendants. (Barnes, Joseph)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Inc, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph M. Barnes* *Reardon Law Firm* *160 Hempstead St., PO Drawer 1430* *New London, CT 06320*. (Carr, Dave)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Ranno, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/31/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/31/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2021 Discovery due by 5/2/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2022 Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2021.(Carr, Dave)
October 31, 2021 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6705224.), filed by Daniel Ranno.(Barnes, Joseph)
October 31, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Barnes, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ranno v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ranno
Represented By: Joseph M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?