Battaglio v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tami Inez Battaglio
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv01460
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2022 to File the Certified Administrative Record by Commissioner of Social Security. (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6705853.), filed by Tami Inez Battaglio.(Grabow, Richard) Modified on 11/1/2021 to correct parties (Anastasio, F.).
November 1, 2021 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
November 1, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 12/31/2021. (Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battaglio v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Inez Battaglio
Represented By: Richard B. Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nicol Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?