Gomez v. Dungarvin Connecticut LLC
Plaintiff: Amarea Gomez
Defendant: Dungarvin Connecticut LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv01503
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/17/2022 at 4:00 PM Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2021 Discovery due by 11/7/2022 Following a pre-filing conference, Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2022 Status Report due by 10/10/2022 Trial Ready Date 6/1/2023.(Tooker, Aimee)
December 16, 2021 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Canalia, Erin)
December 16, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC.(Canalia, Erin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amarea Gomez. (Michaud, Megan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Amarea Gomez (Michaud, Megan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Amarea Gomez (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
November 12, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Dungarvin Connecticut LLC to 12/17/2021. (Reis, Julia)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant's response to Complaint to Dec.17, 2021. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on Nov. 12, 2021. (Arterton, Janet)
November 11, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 17, 2021 to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC. (Canalia, Erin)
November 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Certificate of Notice (Canalia, Erin)
November 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Amended Local Rule Statement (Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC, #10 Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order On Removed Cases)(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/10/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/10/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2022; Discovery due by 5/12/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2022. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2021.(Gutierrez, Y.)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of Dungarvin Connecticut LLC (Etlinger, Deborah)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Local Rule Statement (Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Certificate of Notice (Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Dungarvin Connecticut LLC of Notice of Pending Motions (Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dungarvin Connecticut, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dungarvin Group, Inc., Corporate Parent JOMAD Family Partnership, LP for Dungarvin Connecticut, LLC. (Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Canalia on behalf of Dungarvin Connecticut, LLC (Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dungarvin Connecticut, LLC from Superior Court, case number HHD-CV21-6148669-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6718208, filed by Dungarvin Connecticut, LLC.(Canalia, Erin)
November 10, 2021 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Dungarvin Connecticut LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarea Gomez
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dungarvin Connecticut LLC
Represented By: Deborah Etlinger
Represented By: Erin Canalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?