White v. CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David White
Defendant: CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC, CoreLogic Saferent LLC and Corelogic National Background Data, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00072
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corelogic National Background Data, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoreLogic Information Resources, LLC, Other Affiliate CoreLogic, Inc. for Corelogic National Background Data, LLC. (O'Toole, Andrew)
March 8, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC. (O'Toole, Andrew)
February 24, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. O'Toole on behalf of CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC, Corelogic National Background Data, LLC (O'Toole, Andrew)
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard A Bennett on behalf of David White (Bennett, Leonard)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 24, 2022 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/22/22. (Tooker, Aimee)
February 22, 2022 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
February 18, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 24, 2022 for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC, Corelogic National Background Data, LLC. (O'Toole, Andrew)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leonard A. Bennett, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Leonard A. Bennett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6835895) by David White. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Leonard A. Bennett, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Faulkner, Joanne)
February 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew David Sarrett on behalf of David White (Sarrett, Drew)
February 8, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David White. All Defendants. (Faulkner, Joanne)
February 4, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Carley Marchiando on behalf of David White (Marchiando, Craig)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Drew David Sarrett, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig C. Marchiando, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Drew David Sarrett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6816354) by David White. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Faulkner, Joanne)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig C. Marchiando to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6808615) by David White. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Craig C. Marchiando, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Faulkner, Joanne)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC, Corelogic National Background Data, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joanne S. Faulkner* *Law Offices of Joanne Faulkner* *123 Avon St.* *New Haven, CT 06511-2422*. (Gutierrez, Y.)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/14/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/14/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2022; Discovery due by 7/16/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC, Corelogic National Background Data, LLC, filed by David White.(Hushin, Z.)
January 14, 2022 Filing fee received from Faulkner, Joanne S.: $ 402, receipt number ACTDC-6791284 (Hushin, Z.)
January 14, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Faulkner, Joanne)
January 14, 2022 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Rental Property Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreLogic Saferent LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic National Background Data, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David White
Represented By: Joanne S. Faulkner
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Drew David Sarrett
Represented By: Leonard A Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?