Tomy International, Inc. v. Mayborn USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tomy International, Inc.
Defendant: Mayborn USA, Inc and Mayborn Group Ltd
Case Number: 3:2022cv00165
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avery Hitchcock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6836113) by Tomy International, Inc.. (Hitchcock, Avery)
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas P. Heneghan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6836149) by Tomy International, Inc.. (Heneghan, Thomas)
February 22, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nathan Sportel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6836162) by Tomy International, Inc.. (Sportel, Nathan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mayborn USA, Inc waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/23/2022 filed by Tomy International, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mayborn Group Ltd waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/23/2022 filed by Tomy International, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan Sportel, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/19/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas P. Heneghan, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/19/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Avery Hitchcock, Esq. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/19/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nathan Sportel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6836162) by Tomy International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nathan Sportel)(Coyle, Steven)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas P. Heneghan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6836149) by Tomy International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Thomas P. Heneghan)(Coyle, Steven)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avery Hitchcock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6836113) by Tomy International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Avery Hitchcock)(Coyle, Steven)
February 10, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomy International, Inc.. Mayborn USA, Inc served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022. (Coyle, Steven)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mayborn Group Ltd, Mayborn USA, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven M. Coyle* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tomy International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TOMY Holdings, Inc. for Tomy International, Inc.. (Coyle, Steven)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Tomy International, Inc., #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Gutierrez, Y.)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 1/28/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2022; Discovery due by 7/30/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 9/3/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2022.(Gutierrez, Y.)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6808352.), filed by Tomy International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 9/25/2020 Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 7,185,784, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Patent 8,286,826, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Patent 8,540,112, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Patent 8,807,388, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - '784 Patent Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - '826 Patent Claim Chart)(Coyle, Steven)
January 28, 2022 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Anastasio, F.)
January 28, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Coyle, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomy International, Inc. v. Mayborn USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomy International, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayborn USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayborn Group Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?