Davis v. Henkel Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Brad A. Davis
Defendant: Henkel Corp and Thriving Brands LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00196
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Cases associated. Create association to 3:22-cv-00164-AWT. (Ferguson, L.)
February 18, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Related Case by Brad A. Davis (Reich, Mark)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Alvin W. Thompson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/18/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 16, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Courtney E. Maccarone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6832453) by Brad A. Davis. (Maccarone, Courtney)
February 16, 2022 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark S. Reich to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6832428) by Brad A. Davis. (Reich, Mark)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Attorney Courtney E. Maccarone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/16/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Mark S. Reich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/16/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 15, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Courtney E. Maccarone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6832453) by Brad A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hopkins, Shannon)
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark S. Reich to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6832428) by Brad A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hopkins, Shannon)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon L. Hopkins on behalf of Brad A. Davis (Hopkins, Shannon)
February 9, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/21/2022. (Powell, G.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Toby S. Soli on behalf of Henkel Corp, Thriving Brands LLC (Soli, Toby)
February 2, 2022 Filing 14 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2022 Discovery due by 8/4/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2022 Signed by Clerk on 2/2/2022. (Oliver, T.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 Case electronically transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00782. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING TRANSFER - the parties request, via stipulation (Doc. #6 ), totransfer this case to the District of Connecticut is GRANTED. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut, and the Clerk shall act accordingly. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 02/02/2022. (bjc)
February 2, 2022 Case transferred to District of Connecticut. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (bjc)
February 1, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Transfer Action to District of Connecticut by Plaintiff Brad A. Davis. (Braun, Joseph)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Thriving Brands LLC on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Braun, Joseph)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Henkel Corporation on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Braun, Joseph)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Stuart Wayne for Plaintiff Brad A. Davis (Wayne, Richard)
December 17, 2021 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Stuart Wayne for Plaintiff Brad A. Davis (Wayne, Richard)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8641707), filed by Brad A Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Braun, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Henkel Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad A. Davis
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corp
Represented By: Toby S. Soli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thriving Brands LLC
Represented By: Toby S. Soli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?