Subway Protein Litigation Corp. v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Subway Protein Litigation Corp.
Defendant: Cargill, Inc., Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, JBS S.A., JBS USA Food Company, Swift Beef Company, JBS Packerland, Inc., National Beef Packing Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Cargill, Inc, Cargill Protein and Cargill Protein - North America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00289
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Subway Protein Litigation Corp. of Motion for Transfer Filed with the United States Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - JPML Motion for Transfer)(Yearick, Garth)
March 9, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Subway Protein Litigation Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Subway Worldwide, Inc. for Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Yearick, Garth)
February 28, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Garth T. Yearick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6841236) by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Yearick, Garth)
February 28, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) David B. Esau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6841246) by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Esau, David)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kristin A. Gore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6841219) by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Gore, Kristin)
February 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth Yearick on behalf of Subway Protein Litigation Corp. (Yearick, Garth)
February 25, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bedford Esau on behalf of Subway Protein Litigation Corp. (Esau, David)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Alexandra Gore on behalf of Subway Protein Litigation Corp. (Gore, Kristin)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Attorney David. B. Esau to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/25/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/22. (Payton, R.)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Attorney Garth T. Yearwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/25/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/22. (Payton, R.)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Attorney Kristin A. Gore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/25/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/22. (Payton, R.)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) David B. Esau to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6841246) by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pitblado, John)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Garth T. Yearick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6841236) by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pitblado, John)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kristin A. Gore to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6841219) by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pitblado, John)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Subway Protein Litigation Corp., #7 Standing Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/22/22.(Payton, R.)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/22/22.(Payton, R.)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/22/22.(Payton, R.)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2022 Discovery due by 8/24/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2022 Signed by Clerk on 2/22/22.(Payton, R.)
February 22, 2022 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Walker, J.)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6840587.), filed by Subway Protein Litigation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Pitblado, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Subway Protein Litigation Corp. v. Cargill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Subway Protein Litigation Corp.
Represented By: John C. Pitblado
Represented By: David Bedford Esau
Represented By: Garth Yearick
Represented By: Kristin Alexandra Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS Packerland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Protein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Protein - North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?