Henderson v. Schreiber Law, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Flossie Henderson
Defendant: Schreiber Law, LLC and LVNV Funding LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00344
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/26/22. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 28, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Pre-Filing Conference set for 6/7/2022 at 4:00 PM as follows: 1-877-402-9753; Access Code: 3535720. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, on consent, to 5/5/22. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/25/22. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 26, 2022 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 25, 2022 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 5, 2022 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by LVNV Funding LLC. (Blatchley, Thomas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for permission to file motion for judgment on the pleadings Conference by Schreiber Law, LLC. (Arleo, Robert)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, without prejudice to renew, for failure to comply with the Court's pre-filing conference requirement. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/20/22. (Tooker, Aimee)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Schreiber Law, LLC.Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Arleo, Robert)
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Flossie Henderson by Schreiber Law, LLC.(Arleo, Robert)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Arleo on behalf of Schreiber Law, LLC (Arleo, Robert)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, on consent, to 4/28/22. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/22/22. (Tooker, Aimee)
March 22, 2022 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
March 21, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flossie Henderson. Schreiber Law, LLC served on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Flossie Henderson. LVNV Funding LLC served on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Douglas Bullard on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC (Bullard, Andrew)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/28/2022 file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint by LVNV Funding LLC. (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Blatchley on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC (Blatchley, Thomas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *LVNV Funding LLC, Schreiber Law, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Yaakov Saks* *Stein Saks, PLLC* *One University Plaza Suite 620* *Hackensack, NJ 07601*. (Reis, Julia)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Flossie Henderson, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 3/3/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/3/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/3/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines:Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2022. Discovery due by 9/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 3/3/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LVNV Funding LLC, Schreiber Law, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6852258.), filed by Flossie Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 civil cover sheet)(Saks, Yaakov)
March 3, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to LVNV Funding LLC, Schreiber Law, LLC. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 3, 2022 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Schreiber Law, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flossie Henderson
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schreiber Law, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: Andrew Douglas Bullard
Represented By: Thomas C. Blatchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?