Henderson v. Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Flossie Henderson
Defendant: Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. and Crown Asset Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00345
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties have reported that this action has been settled. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before May 11, 2022. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the court's file), they may do so on or before May 11, 2022. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/11/2022.(Lewis, D)
March 11, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Flossie Henderson (Saks, Yaakov)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Crown Asset Management, LLC, Sunrise Credit Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Yaakov Saks* *Stein Saks, PLLC* *One University Plaza Suite 620* *Hackensack, NJ 07601*. (Freberg, B)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Flossie Henderson, #5 Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 3/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Re Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2022; Discovery due by 9/2/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 10/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 3/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crown Asset Management, LLC, Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6852321.), filed by Flossie Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 civil cover sheet)(Saks, Yaakov)
March 3, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Crown Asset Management, LLC, Sunrise Credit Services, Inc.. (Saks, Yaakov)
March 3, 2022 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Sunrise Credit Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flossie Henderson
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Credit Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?