Duhaime v. Elements Brands, LLC
Plaintiff: Diane Duhaime
Defendant: Elements Brands, LLC doing business as Rockin Green
Case Number: 3:2022cv00402
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Diane Duhaime (Leviton, Jason)
April 20, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Elements Brands, LLC to 5/22/2022. (Ferguson, L.)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by 5/22/2022. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/20/2022. (Milov-Cordoba, M.)
April 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 22, 2022 to respond to Complaint by Elements Brands, LLC. (Gabriel, Michael)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Gabriel on behalf of Elements Brands, LLC (Gabriel, Michael)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint etc. served on Elements Brands LLC on 04/01/2022, filed by Diane Duhaime. (Leviton, Jason)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Elements Brands, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jason M. Leviton* *Block & Leviton LLP* *260 Franklin Street, Ste 1860* *Boston, MA 02110*. (LaLone, L.)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Diane Duhaime, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 3/21/2022.(LaLone, L.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/18/2022.(LaLone, L.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/18/2022.(LaLone, L.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2022 Discovery due by 9/17/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2022 Signed by Clerk on 3/18/2022.(LaLone, L.)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elements Brands, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6870073.), filed by Diane Duhaime. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leviton, Jason) Modified on 3/18/2022 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 18, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Elements Brands, LLC. (Leviton, Jason) Modified on 3/18/2022 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
March 18, 2022 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duhaime v. Elements Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Duhaime
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elements Brands, LLC doing business as Rockin Green
Represented By: Michael G. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?