USAA General Indemnity Company v. Titeflex Corporation
Plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Defendant: Titeflex Corp
Case Number: 3:2022cv00431
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony J. Morrone. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anthony J. Morrone, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6908307) by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Duey, Eric)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting on consent #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before June 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/12/2022. (Sweeney, Kevin)
April 12, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Titeflex Corp identifying Corporate Parent Smiths Group International Holdings Ltd. for Titeflex Corp. (Tabasky, Jonathan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/17/2022 for Titeflex to Answer Complaint by Titeflex Corp. (Tabasky, Jonathan)
April 12, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Defendant Titeflex Corporation: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before June 17, 2022. (Sweeney, Kevin)
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USAA General Indemnity Company. Titeflex Corp served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Duey, Eric)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Titeflex Corp* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eric Andrew Duey* *Blackburn & Donnelly, LLC* *2 Concorde Way, P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096-0608*. (Fanelle, N.)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USAA General Indemnity Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/24/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/23/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/23/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2022 Discovery due by 9/22/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2022 Signed by Clerk on 3/23/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Titeflex Corporation ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6875421.), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company a/s/o Amanda Stockdale.(Duey, Eric)
March 23, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Titeflex Corporation. (Duey, Eric)
March 23, 2022 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USAA General Indemnity Company v. Titeflex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Eric Andrew Duey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titeflex Corp
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?