USA v. Kolade et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and USA
Defendant: Ebenezer A Kolade and Christina M Kolade
Case Number: 3:2022cv00459
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ebenezer A Kolade waiver sent on 4/13/2022, answer due 6/12/2022 filed by USA. (Gadelhak, Ali)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christina M Kolade waiver sent on 4/13/2022, answer due 6/12/2022 filed by USA. (Gadelhak, Ali)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/29/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/28/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/28/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/27/2022. Discovery due by 9/27/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2022. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 28, 2022 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christina M Kolade, Ebenezer A Kolade, filed by United States of America.(Gadelhak, Ali)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Kolade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ali Gadelhak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Ali Gadelhak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebenezer A Kolade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina M Kolade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?