Masonicare Corporation v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Plaintiff: Masonicare Corporation
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Case Number: 3:2022cv00743
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, #5 Answer to Complaint filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, #8 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/8/2022. (Mendez, D)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Defendant Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LPs Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract)(Berglund, Curtis)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/3/2022. (Mendez, D)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/3/2022. (Mendez, D)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2022. Discovery due by 12/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2023. Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2022. (Mendez, D)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP. (Berglund, Curtis)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP Defendant Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Berglund, Curtis)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP Notice of No Pending Motions (Berglund, Curtis)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP from New Haven Superior Court, case number NNH-CV22-6123291-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6955011, filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Officer's Return, #4 Exhibit Secretary of State Report, #5 Exhibit Email Correspendence, #6 Exhibit Notice of Removal to the New Haven Superior Court, #7 Exhibit Civil Action Sheet)(Berglund, Curtis)
June 3, 2022 Judge Omar A. Williams added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masonicare Corporation v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masonicare Corporation
Represented By: Brendan T. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?