Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. v. 77 South Street, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.
Defendant: 77 South Street, LLC., C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC., Christopher Campanaro and Michael Kozlowski
Case Number: 3:2022cv00757
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendants 77 South Street, LLC, C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC, Christopher Campanaro, and Michael Kozlowski (herein "Defendants"). Defendants represent that they need additional time "to investigate the allegations contained in the Complaint and formulate responses to them." Doc. #11 , at 1. Furthermore, Defendants aver that "Plaintiff's counsel consents to the requested extension." Id. Under these circumstances, the Court GRANTS Defendants' requested extension. Accordingly, Defendants must answer or respond to the #1 Complaint on or before July 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on July 12, 2022. (Dorais, L.)
July 12, 2022 Answer deadline updated for 77 South Street, LLC., C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC., Christopher Campanaro, and Michael Kozlowski to 7/26/2022. (Barry, Donna)
July 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2022 to File a Responsive Pleading by 77 South Street, LLC., C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC., Christopher Campanaro, Michael Kozlowski. (Cassot, Robert)
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. Michael Kozlowski served on 6/26/2022, answer due 7/17/2022. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. Christopher Campanaro served on 6/25/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC. served on 6/25/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. 77 South Street, LLC. served on 6/25/2022, answer due 7/16/2022. (Blackburn, Stuart)
June 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Cassot on behalf of 77 South Street, LLC., C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC., Christopher Campanaro, Michael Kozlowski (Cassot, Robert)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *77 South Street, LLC., C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC., Christopher Campanaro, Michael Kozlowski* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 6/9/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2022 Discovery due by 12/9/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2023 Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6960789.), filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. (Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 6/9/2022 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).
June 9, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 77 South Street, LLC.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
June 9, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
June 9, 2022 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Freberg, B)
June 9, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Michael Kozlowski. (Blackburn, Stuart)
June 9, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Christopher Campanaro. (Blackburn, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. v. 77 South Street, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 77 South Street, LLC.
Represented By: Robert W. Cassot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & S Cornerstone Properties, LLC.
Represented By: Robert W. Cassot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Campanaro
Represented By: Robert W. Cassot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kozlowski
Represented By: Robert W. Cassot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?