Gartner, Inc v. Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gartner, Inc
Defendant: Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00920
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2022 Filing 27 Case electronically transferred to the District of Southern District of New York. (Walker, J.)
August 17, 2022 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: 27 Case Transferred Out: CASE: 3:22-cv-00920. DETAILS: Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-07000, filed 08/17/2022. (Walker, J.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Attorney Kelsey E. Bleiweissto Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/14/2022. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/15/2022. (Carr, Dave)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Attorney Michael S. Biehl to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/14/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022. (Carr, Dave)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for for Attorney Robert B. Ellis, P. C to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/14/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022. (Carr, Dave)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER OF TRANSFER. On the basis of defendant's unopposed motion to transfer, the Court GRANTS the motion (Doc. #19 ), and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York where a prior-filed related action is pending. See Gartner, Inc. v. HCC Specialty Underwriters, Inc., No. 20-cv-4885 (JGK) (S.D.N.Y.) It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/12/22. (Barry, Donna)
August 11, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #19 MOTION to Transfer to Another District Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Transfer to Another District filed by Gartner, Inc. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
August 3, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kelsey E. Bleiweiss to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7022193) by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Newbury, Philip)
August 3, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael S. Biehl to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7021486) by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Newbury, Philip)
August 3, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert B. Ellis, P. C. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7021473) by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Newbury, Philip)
August 3, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Newbury, Philip)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #17 ) until September 2, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/29/22. (Barry, Donna)
July 29, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. to 9/2/2022. (Barry, Donna)
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/02/2022 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Newbury, Philip)
July 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Ellis Williams on behalf of Gartner, Inc (Williams, Tracy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gartner, Inc. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
July 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Zeitlin on behalf of Gartner, Inc (Zeitlin, Andrew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #5 Jury Demand filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #7 Notice (Other) filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc., #11 Electronic Filing Order, #12 Protective Order, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(Carr, Dave)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/22/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/22/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2022 Discovery due by 1/21/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice to Counsel re Local Rules) (Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance with Standing Orders) (Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip T. Newbury, Jr on behalf of Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. (Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Notice of Removal)(Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc. from Stamford Superior Court, case number FST CV 22 6057519S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7007986, filed by Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint)(Newbury, Philip)
July 22, 2022 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gartner, Inc v. Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gartner, Inc
Represented By: Andrew M. Zeitlin
Represented By: Tracy Ellis Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon/Albert G. Ruben Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Represented By: Philip T. Newbury, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?