Rodriguez v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Richard L. Rodriguez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv01037
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Government having filed its administrative record (Doc. No. 13), the court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before December 6, 2022. Defendant shall file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before February 6, 2023. Plaintiff may file a reply brief pursuant to Local Rule 7(d) on or before February 20, 2023. Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, counsel are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate. The court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions, supporting memoranda, and statement of materials facts. (Doc. No. 5) The parties should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case. Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Requests for extensions of these deadlines are discouraged and, unless unusual circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should not seek an extension of greater than 30 days. Any motion for extension of a deadline must include a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three days before the existing deadline. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/11/22.(Caldero, M.)
October 7, 2022 Filing 13 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement part 1, #2 Supplement part 2, #3 Supplement part 3, #4 Supplement part 4, #5 Supplement part 5, #6 Supplement part 6, #7 Supplement part 7, #8 Supplement part 8)(Pollack, Kathryn)
October 5, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi, Richard L. Rodriguez. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/5/2022.(Anastasio, F.)
September 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by Richard L. Rodriguez Notice, Consent & Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Pollack on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Pollack, Kathryn)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in light of the payment of the filing fee on 9/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia on 9/8/22. (Lefevre, Arthur)
September 6, 2022 Filing fee received from Michalik, Bauer, Silva & Ciccarillo, LLP: $ 402.00, receipt number 25599 (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See the attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia on 8/29/22. (Lefevre, Arthur)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Reis, Julia)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/17/2022. (Reis, Julia)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/17/2022. (Reis, Julia)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Reis, Julia)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard L. Rodriguez. (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Richard L. Rodriguez.(Ciccarillo, Dennis)
August 17, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Kilolo Kijakazi to 10/16/2022. (Reis, Julia)
August 17, 2022 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia added. Motions referred to Maria E. Garcia.(Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Rodriguez
Represented By: Dennis G. Ciccarillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kathryn Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?