Pichardo Suarez v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Maria Josefina Pichar Suarez and Maria Josefina Pichardo Suarez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv01074
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to Agency by Kilolo Kijakazi.Responses due by 11/8/2022 (Zeigler, Anne)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. The Commissioner shall file the record (including a PDF-searchable version of the record) on or before November 3, 2022; plaintiff may file a motion to reverse or remand on or before January 3, 2023; and the Commission may file any motion to affirm or remand by March 3, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/12/22.(Barry, Donna)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/11/22.(Barry, Donna)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this cases is reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2022.(Anastasio, F.)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Zeigler on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Zeigler, Anne)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis in light of the payment of the filing fee on September 13, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia on 9/14/22. (Esposito, A.)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time until September 14, 2022 to file response to Order of the Court #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia on 9/14/2022. (Esposito, A.)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 14, 2022 to file response to Order of the Court #8 Order by Maria Josefina Pichardo Suarez. (Katz, Ivan)
September 13, 2022 Filing fee received from Ivan katz, Esq.: $ 402.00, receipt number 25633 (Freberg, B)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maria Josefina Pichar Suarez. Please see order for important deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia on 8/29/22. (Esposito, A.)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria Josefina Pichar Suarez. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Maria Josefina Pichar Suarez (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Maria Josefina Pichar Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Kilolo Kijakazi to 10/23/2022. (Chartier, AnnMarie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pichardo Suarez v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Josefina Pichar Suarez
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Josefina Pichardo Suarez
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Anne M Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?