Avery v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn M. Avery
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01077
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 14 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel. (Fanelle, N.)
September 15, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
September 15, 2022 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:22- cv-06889, filed 09/15/2022. (Oliver, T.)
September 15, 2022 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (Oliver, T.)
September 1, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Cook Group Incorporated to 9/19/2022; Cook Incorporated to 9/19/2022; Cook Medical Incorporated to 9/19/2022; Cook Medical LLC to 9/19/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
August 31, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Cook Medical LLC on 08/29/2022, filed by Gwendolyn M. Avery. (Moskow, Neal)
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Cook Medical Incorporated on 08/29/2022, filed by Gwendolyn M. Avery. (Moskow, Neal)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on Cook Incorporated on 08/29/2022, filed by Gwendolyn M. Avery. (Moskow, Neal)
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on Cook Group Incorporated on 08/29/2022, filed by Gwendolyn M. Avery. (Moskow, Neal)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Medical LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Medical Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Group Incorporated* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Gwendolyn M. Avery, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/25/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/25/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2022 Discovery due by 2/24/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2023 Signed by Clerk on 8/25/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7046690.), filed by Gwendolyn M. Avery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal)
August 25, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
August 25, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
August 25, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical LLC. (Moskow, Neal)
August 25, 2022 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Freberg, B)
August 25, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Group Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn M. Avery
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?