Simoniz USA Inc v. J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Simoniz USA Inc
Defendant: J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc. and J.E.P., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01091
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to J.E.P., Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022; J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022 filed by Simoniz USA Inc. (Blackburn, Stuart)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *J.E.P., Inc., J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Peterson, M)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Simoniz USA Inc, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/29/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 08/29/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2022. Discovery due by 2/28/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/4/2023. Signed by Clerk on 08/29/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7050251.), filed by Simoniz USA, Inc..(Blackburn, Stuart)
August 29, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Blackburn, Stuart)
August 29, 2022 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simoniz USA Inc v. J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simoniz USA Inc
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Noonan Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E.P., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?