USA v. Cuevas et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America and USA
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company and Jeanette Marie Cuevas
Case Number: 3:2022cv01100
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. This case has been reported settled. This case is therefore DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so on or before November 5, 2022. The dates set forth in this order may be extended upon a showing of good cause in a motion made under Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/5/2022.(Davis, Christina)
October 5, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Jeanette Marie Cuevas served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022; Progressive Direct Insurance Company served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (Nelson, David)
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jeanette Marie Cuevas, Progressive Direct Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Christopher Nelson* *U.S. Attorney's Office-NH* *157 Church St., 25th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 09/01/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2022. Discovery due by 3/1/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2023. Signed by Clerk on 08/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 30, 2022 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Freberg, B)
August 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States Of America.(Nelson, David)
August 30, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Nelson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Cuevas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Marie Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?