Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Real Estate Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Fairfield County Bank, Donald Boyce, Elizabeth Boyce, Home Spec, LLC, Connecticut Basement Systems Radon, Inc., Wayne Dimm Enterprises, Inc. and Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv01106
Filed: September 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Donald Boyce, Elizabeth Boyce, Connecticut Basement Systems Radon, Inc., Fairfield County Bank, Home Spec, LLC, Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America, Wayne Dimm Enterprises, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Ciollo* *Morrison Mahoney LLP - Hartford* *One Constitution Plaza 10th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Peterson, M)
September 7, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Ciollo, Joseph)
September 6, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The North River Insurance Company for Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Ciollo, Joseph)
September 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc., #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 09/02/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/01/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/01/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2022. Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2023. Signed by Clerk on 09/01/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7054501.), filed by Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ciollo, Joseph) Modified on 9/1/2022 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
September 1, 2022 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc. v. Real Estate Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R. Ciollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield County Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Spec, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Basement Systems Radon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Dimm Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?