Osman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Venestra Osman
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner Of and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv01122
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 dc Review of SSA Decision SSDC - Concurrent Title II and Title XVI Claims
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 11 Social Security Transcripts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 1, #2 Supplement 2, #3 Supplement 3, #4 Supplement 4, #5 Supplement 5, #6 Supplement 6, #7 Supplement 7, #8 Supplement 8, #9 Supplement 9, #10 Supplement 10, #11 Supplement 11, #12 Supplement 12, #13 Supplement 13, #14 Supplement 14, #15 Supplement 15)(Molinaro, John)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/1/2022.(Hushin, Z.)
October 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Molinaro on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Molinaro, John)
October 18, 2022 Filing 8 Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia for all purposes including issuing a Recommended Ruling. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/18/2022.(Anastasio, F.)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMINDER: Standing Order on Social Security Appeal Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by June Lee Byun on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner Of (Byun, June)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 consent form)(Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Venestra Osman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 envelope)(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 9/21/2022 to correct defendant's name (Imbriani, Susan).
September 6, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Social Security, Commissioner Of to 11/6/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Filing fee received from Vanestra Osman: $ 402.00, receipt number 19373 (Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security . (Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 9/21/2022 as to name of defendant (Imbriani, Susan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venestra Osman
Represented By: Russell D. Zimberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John Molinaro
Represented By: June Lee Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?