Echevarria v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Nitza Echevarria
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group, Inc. and Cook Medical LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01348
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:22-cv-06927, filed 11/29/2022. (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2022 Filing 11 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel on 11/29/2022. (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2022 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (Oliver, T.)
November 3, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Cook Group, Inc. to 11/22/2022; Cook Incorporated to 11/22/2022; Cook Medical Incorporated to 11/22/2022; Cook Medical LLC to 11/22/2022. (Oliver, T.)
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on Cook Group Incorporated on 11/01/2022, filed by Nitza Echevarria. (Moskow, Neal)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on Cook Incorporated on 11/01/2022, filed by Nitza Echevarria. (Moskow, Neal)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on Cook Medical Incorporated on 11/01/2022, filed by Nitza Echevarria. (Moskow, Neal)
November 3, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Return of Service served on Cook Medical LLC on 11/01/2022, filed by Nitza Echevarria. (Moskow, Neal)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Moskow Law Group, LLC* *883 Black Rock Turnpike Second Floor* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Reis, Julia)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Nitza Echevarria, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/26/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/26/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/25/2022. Discovery due by 4/27/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7114221.), filed by Nitza Echevarria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal)
October 26, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
October 26, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Group Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
October 26, 2022 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
October 26, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Incorporated. (Moskow, Neal)
October 26, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Cook Medical LLC. (Moskow, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echevarria v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nitza Echevarria
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?