Soldevilla v. Thriving Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dianne Soldevilla
Defendant: Thriving Brands LLC and Henkel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv01362
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 21 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Florida ; Case Number 0:21-cv-62573.
October 26, 2022 Judge Omar A. Williams and Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #11 Motion transfer case to District of Connecticut. The Clerk is instructed to TRANSFER this Action to the District of Connecticut. This case is CLOSED, and all pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
April 28, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION to Transfer this Action to the District of Connecticut and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. (Salky, Mark)
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. (Salky, Mark)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Henkel Corporation and Thriving Brands LLC shall file their reply in support of their motion to transfer on or before Thursday, April 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 21, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Transfer this Action to the District of Connecticut and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Replies due by 4/28/2022. PER DE# 17 (cds)
April 19, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 MOTION to Transfer this Action to the District of Connecticut and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salky, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer this Action to the District of Connecticut and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Alain Michael, Dianne Soldevilla. Replies due by 4/21/2022. (Richards, Robert)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss on or before April 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 12, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Salky, Mark)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alain Michael, Dianne Soldevilla. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Richards, Robert)
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer this Action to the District of Connecticut and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Goldstein Consolidation Order, #2 Exhibit B - Goldstein Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Elizabeth Kenny)(Salky, Mark)
March 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. Responses due by 4/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Goldstein Consolidation Order, #2 Exhibit B - Goldstein Complaint)(Salky, Mark)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Henkel Corporation and Thriving Brands LLC shall have thirty pages, using double-spaced Times New Roman 12-point typeface to respond to the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before March 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint and Motion for Enlargement of Page Limitation re #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. Responses due by 3/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Salky, Mark)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond the Amended Complaint on or before March 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. Attorney Mark Allan Salky added to party Henkel Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Allan Salky added to party Thriving Brands, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Salky, Mark)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC, filed by Dianne Soldevilla, Alain Michael. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Valisure FDA Citizen Petition))(Richards, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Henkel Corporation, Thriving Brands, LLC. (jas)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HENKEL CORPORATION, THRIVING BRANDS LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15277495, filed by DIANNE SOLDEVILLA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Henkel Corporation, #4 Summon(s) Thriving Brands LLC)(Richards, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soldevilla v. Thriving Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Soldevilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thriving Brands LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?