Santopietro v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Santopietro
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01382
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2022 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:22-cv-07275, filed 11/30/2022. (Oliver, T.)
November 30, 2022 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of New York. (Oliver, T.)
November 22, 2022 Filing 8 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Eastern District of New York. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 11/22/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 22, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Mendez, D)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/7/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Philip F. Von Kuhn* *Coyne, von Kuhn, Brady & Fries, LLC* *4 Armstrong Road* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Mendez, D)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Santopietro, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2022.(Mendez, D)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/2/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/2/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2023. Discovery due by 5/4/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7122814.), filed by Christopher Santopietro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Von Kuhn, Philip)
November 2, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Von Kuhn, Philip)
November 2, 2022 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santopietro v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Santopietro
Represented By: Philip F. Von Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?