Vazzano et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Vazzano, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr., Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, David Fields, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Owen, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Joanne Whitman, Jess Monma, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Kevin Richards, Bruce Richards, Elizabeth Stewart, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Bill Vandermolen, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Bernadine Andrews, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr., Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman and Robert Own
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC and Sanofi US Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01435
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Emily Renshaw Pistilli to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7187145) by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Glasser, James)
January 4, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) M. Elaine Horn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7187143) by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Glasser, James)
January 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time until January 17, 2023 to file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/1/23. (Heavenrich, S.)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCUSE. The Court GRANTS the motion to excuse in-person appearance of clients (Doc. #34 ). If, however, any clients or client representatives of either party wishes to observe the court hearing by Zoom, then counsel may contact Judge Meyer's courtroom deputy to request such arrangements. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/22/22. (Barry, Donna)
December 21, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for 'Motion to Excuse In-Person Attendance' Order by Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman. (Raabe, Craig)
December 15, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) filed by Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Craig Raabe)(Bruegger, John)
December 12, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION.Oral argument on motion to remand (Doc. #24 ) and motion for leave to withdraw plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Doc. #26 ) set set for January 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. For cases involving parties who are represented by counsel, Judge Meyer ordinarily expects that the parties themselves will be present for hearings on any dispositive motions (i.e., motions to dismiss and for summary judgment). If an individual party (or party representative in the case of a company/entity party) is not present, Judge Meyer will inquire of counsel why the party or party representative has chosen not to attend the hearing and may require the filing of a signed waiver of presence with a statement of reasons. If the argument is scheduled to proceed in full or in part by means of a video link, then the parties or party representatives are welcome to attend the argument by video. (Barry, Donna)
December 8, 2022 Filing 31 OBJECTION re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Glasser, James)
November 29, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bruegger on behalf of Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman (Bruegger, John)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/18/22.(Barry, Donna)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/18/2022. (Ferguson, L.)
November 17, 2022 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO CLARIFY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed by Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman. (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO CLARIFY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman. (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) filed by Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) by Bernadine Andrews, David Fields, Brandon Lee, Khatilen Lee, Kennth Lewis, Clarence Lloyd, Jr, Tarik Logan, Cynterrta London, Carlos Luna, Steven Lusk, Michael MacDonald, Vincent Maddox, Vernon Marshall, Asiameik Mayo, Warith McDaniel, Anthony McMurray, Ruby Mcnair, Mary Midkiff, Sarah Miles, Gail Miller, Jess Monma, Steven Moore, Stephanie Morgan, Tyree Murry, Derrick Nakano, Jarvis Neil, John Orourke, Robert Own, Maria Parisi, Lesley Parker, Debbie Peters, Shonn Pierce, Ronnie Pullen, Tina Radabaugh, Emil Randle, Lillie Randol, Herald Reed, Jack Reinhardt, Regina Reynolds, Margaret Ricardo, Bruce Richards, Kevin Richards, Rick Rizzato, David Sammons, Paul Sanguesa, Alvin Sansom, Murray Sesay, Erica Skinner, Anastacia Smith, Antwon Smith, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Connie Spear, Michele Stein, Rebecca Stevenson, Denarius Stewart, Elizabeth Stewart, Tayvionna Stuart, Bobby Tavernier, Lois Toker, Antoine Tolbert, Deladeia Turner, Bill Vandermolen, Thomas Vazzano, Angela Walton, Glenn Walton, Linda Weber, Ray Wesson, Larry Westervelt, Jr, Selena Weyer, Tazaras White, Joanne Whitman, Kathy Wight, Darius Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Maurice Williams, Keshia Wilson, Sharon Wilson, Linda Woodward, Wims Wooten, Kim Zimmerman.Responses due by 12/8/2022 (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline Finance plc, Corporate Parent GSK Finance (No 2) Limited for Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC. (Simpson, Robert)
November 17, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC of Statement Regarding Standing Order In Removed Cases (Glasser, James)
November 16, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Martini, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Martini, Joseph)
November 15, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2023 to file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Notice of Removal,, by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Simpson, Robert)
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Related Case by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Glasser, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer, Inc.. (Glasser, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Eastwood, Janna)
November 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Martini on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Martini, Joseph)
November 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Fahey, Patrick)
November 11, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Welsh, Jaime)
November 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Ashley Welsh on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Welsh, Jaime)
November 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc. (Greenspoon, Lauren)
November 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc. (Simpson, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #14 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Pfizer, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Sanofi US Services Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Pfizer, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, #16 Protective Order, #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pfizer, Inc., #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, #13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with filed by Lois Toker, Steven Lusk, Paul Sanguesa, Warith McDaniel, Maurice Williams, Jeffrey Williams, Nelinda Sobrenilla, Selena Weyer, Ruby Mcnair, Denarius Stewart, Bruce Richards, Herald Reed, Michele Stein, Lillie Randol, Jarvis Neil, Bobby Tavernier, Wims Wooten, Brandon Lee, Robert Own, Gail Miller, Rebecca Stevenson, Debbie Peters, Stephanie Morgan, Tayvionna Stuart, Erica Skinner, Keshia Wilson, Regina Reynolds, Ronnie Pullen, Jack Reinhardt, Lesley Parker, Ray Wesson, John Orourke, Khatilen Lee, Steven Moore, David Fields, Antoine Tolbert, Shonn Pierce, Darius Williams, Murray Sesay, Anthony McMurray, Joanne Whitman, Emil Randle, Tazaras White, Sarah Miles, Asiameik Mayo, Jess Monma, Connie Spear, David Sammons, Bill Vandermolen, Linda Woodward, Thomas Vazzano, Tina Radabaugh, Maria Parisi, Larry Westervelt, Jr., Antwon Smith, Glenn Walton, Vincent Maddox, Bernadine Andrews, Michael MacDonald, Kathy Wight, Carlos Luna, Kevin Richards, Sharon Wilson, Linda Weber, Kennth Lewis, Angela Walton, Tarik Logan, Derrick Nakano, Vernon Marshall, Cynterrta London, Elizabeth Stewart, Rick Rizzato, Anastacia Smith, Kim Zimmerman, Deladeia Turner, Tyree Murry, Alvin Sansom, Clarence Lloyd, Jr., Mary Midkiff, Margaret Ricardo, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Pfizer, Inc., #15 Electronic Filing Order, #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #4 Certificate of Service filed by Pfizer, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases). (Barry, L)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/10/2022. (Barry, L)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/10/2022. (Barry, L)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2023 Discovery due by 5/12/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2023 Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022. (Barry, L)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Responses due by 12/1/2022.(Anastasio, F.)
November 10, 2022 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pfizer, Inc. Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing to Superior Court with Copy of Notice of Removal)(Glasser, James)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Craven on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Craven, James)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Pfizer, Inc. Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Glasser, James)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Danbury, case number DBD-CV22-6044212-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7133622, filed by GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 [Exhibits 1-10], #2 Exhibit 9A)(Glasser, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazzano et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Vazzano
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lee
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khatilen Lee
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennth Lewis
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Lloyd, Jr.
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarik Logan
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynterrta London
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Luna
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lusk
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael MacDonald
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Maddox
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Marshall
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asiameik Mayo
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warith McDaniel
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony McMurray
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Mcnair
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Midkiff
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Miles
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Miller
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Moore
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Morgan
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fields
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyree Murry
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Nakano
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarvis Neil
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Orourke
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Parisi
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Parker
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Peters
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Whitman
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jess Monma
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonn Pierce
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Pullen
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Radabaugh
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Randle
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Randol
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herald Reed
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Reinhardt
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Reynolds
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Ricardo
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Richards
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Richards
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stewart
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Rizzato
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sammons
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sanguesa
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Sansom
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Vandermolen
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Sesay
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Skinner
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastacia Smith
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwon Smith
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelinda Sobrenilla
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Spear
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Stein
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Stevenson
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denarius Stewart
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tayvionna Stuart
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Tavernier
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Toker
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Tolbert
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deladeia Turner
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Walton
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Walton
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Weber
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Andrews
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Wesson
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Westervelt, Jr.
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Weyer
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tazaras White
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wight
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Williams
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Williams
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Williams
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshia Wilson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wilson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Woodward
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wims Wooten
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Zimmerman
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Own
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc.
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Jaime Ashley Welsh
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Jaime Ashley Welsh
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Martini
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Jaime Ashley Welsh
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: James O. Craven
Represented By: James I. Glasser
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline LLC
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Represented By: Joseph W. Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?