Goodridge v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Goodridge
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01553
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:23-cv-00038, filed 01/04/2023. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2023 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of New York. (Oliver, T.)
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Eastern District of New York. Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 12/28/2022. (Barry, L) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2023: #1 Replacement PDF with Stamp) (Barry, L)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Edward P. Brady, III* *Coyne, von Kuhn, Brady & Fries, LLC* *4 Armstrong Road* *Shelton, CT 06484*. (Barry, L)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Kelly Goodridge Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2022. (Barry, L)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/7/2022. (Barry, L)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/7/2022. (Barry, L)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/5/2023 Discovery due by 6/8/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2023 Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2022. (Barry, L)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2022.(Anastasio, F.)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7160311.), filed by Kelly Goodridge. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Brady, Edward)
December 7, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Brady, Edward)
December 7, 2022 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodridge v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Goodridge
Represented By: Edward P. Brady, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?