Ambrose v. Parlato
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Ambrose
Defendant: Frank Jr. Parlato and Frank Parlato, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01648
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert A Richardson
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Notification to the Court by Christopher A. Ambrose (Peterson, M)
February 3, 2023 Filing 9 Defendant Frank Parlato, Jr.'s Declaration in OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Frank Parlato, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
January 26, 2023 Filing fee received from Frank R. Parlato Jr.: $ 402.00, receipt number 19840 (Peterson, M)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christopher A. Ambrose. Responses due by 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Peterson, M)
January 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Protective Order, 2 Order re: Filing Fee, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Frank Jr. Parlato, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/27/2022. (Barry, L)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/27/2022. (Barry, L)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2023 Discovery due by 6/28/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2023 Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2022. (Barry, L)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: We received your Notice of Removal which has been assigned case number 22cv1648. In order to proceed, the filing fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis must be submitted to the Court by 1/26/2023 or the case will be subject to dismissal. Fee information and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis form may be found on the Court's website at ctd.uscourts.gov. Dismissal due by 1/26/2023 Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frank Jr. Parlato from Judicial District of New Haven, case number NNH-CV22-5054243-S., filed by Frank Jr. Parlato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(Chartier, AnnMarie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2022: #3 Replacement PDF: Notice of Removal Complaint, #4 Replacement PDF: Exhibit A) (Chartier, AnnMarie).
December 27, 2022 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Hushin, Z.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrose v. Parlato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Jr. Parlato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Parlato, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?