Ramos v. Amazon.com Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wilmerrys Ramos
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC, Securitas Services, Inc., Metro One Loss Prevention Services Group, Inc and M-1 Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Amazon.com Services, LLC to 3/20/2023. (Velez, F.)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting without objection Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, ECF No. 16, to and including March 20, 2023. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 02/23/23. (Codeanne, K.)
February 23, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/9/2023. (Velez, F.)
February 22, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 20, 2023 AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLCS ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #13 Amended Complaint by Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Klein, Daniel)
February 22, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Miller on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC (Miller, Emily)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *M-1 Corporation, Metro One Loss Prevention Services Group, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher James Berlingieri* *Berlingieri Law, PLLC* *244 Fifth Avenue, Suite F276* *New York, NY 10001*. (Barry, L)
February 16, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services, LLC, Metro One Loss Prevention Services Group, Inc, M-1 Corporation, filed by Wilmerrys Ramos.(Berlingieri, Christopher)
February 16, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to M-1 Corporation, Metro One Loss Prevention Services Group, Inc. (Berlingieri, Christopher)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER noting and so ordering Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Securitas Services, Inc., ECF No. 11. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 02/13/23. (Codeanne, K.)
February 9, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of defendant SECURITAS SERVICES, INC., only by Wilmerrys Ramos (Berlingieri, Christopher)
January 24, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services, LLC. (Klein, Daniel)
January 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Klein on behalf of Amazon.com Services, LLC (Klein, Daniel)
January 24, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Amazon.com Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/3/2023, answer due 3/4/2023 filed by Wilmerrys Ramos. (Berlingieri, Christopher)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Amazon.com Services, LLC, Securitas Services, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher James Berlingieri* *Berlingieri Law, PLLC* *244 Fifth Avenue, Suite F276* *New York, NY 10001*. (Barry, L)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Wilmerrys Ramos, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2023. (Barry, L)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/2/2023. (Barry, L)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/2/2023. (Barry, L)
January 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2023 Discovery due by 7/4/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/8/2023 Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2023. (Barry, L)
January 2, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
January 2, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
January 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Services, LLC, Securitas Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7183256.), filed by Wilmerrys Ramos.(Berlingieri, Christopher)
January 2, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Amazon.com Services, LLC, Securitas Services, Inc.. (Berlingieri, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Amazon.com Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmerrys Ramos
Represented By: Christopher James Berlingieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Klein
Represented By: Emily Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro One Loss Prevention Services Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-1 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?