Moriarty v. Target Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosita Moriarty
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc. and Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00096
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The court thanks the parties for submitting their Rule 26(f) Planning Report, see ECF No. #16 , and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein, and as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed on or before February 15, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 15, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before April 15, 2024 if motions for summary judgment are not filed. If motions for summary judgment are filed, the court will set a deadline for the joint trial memorandum at the time it disposes of such motions. The case shall be trial ready by April 15, 2024. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/22/2023. (Mamillapalli, S.).
February 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Rosita Moriarty (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
February 20, 2023 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Reilly, Michael)
February 20, 2023 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rosita Moriarty. (Reilly, Michael)
February 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Reilly on behalf of Rosita Moriarty (Reilly, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Target Stores, Inc..(Dwyer, Renee)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 7 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Target Stores, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Target Stores, Inc., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., 11 Notice 83.1,, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., #10 Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Target Stores, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Barry, L)
January 26, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2023. (Velez, F.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2023. (Barry, L)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/25/2023. (Barry, L)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/25/2023. (Barry, L)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2023 Discovery due by 7/27/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2023 Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2023. (Barry, L)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/23.(Hushin, Z.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. re: Statement Pursuant to Standing Order (Dwyer, Renee) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
January 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. re: Civil & Miscellaneous Orders (Dwyer, Renee) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. re: Pending Motions (Dwyer, Renee) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Stores, Inc.(Dwyer, Renee) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Target Stores, Inc. (Dwyer, Renee) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Stores, Inc. from Middletown Superior Court, case number MMX-CV23-6036306-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7211599, filed by Target Stores, Inc. (Dwyer, Renee) Modified on 1/25/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
January 25, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moriarty v. Target Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosita Moriarty
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?